Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2021 | Read first time. To print. |