Assembly
|
02/01/2022
|
Died on inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Wood.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|