Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. | ||
Assembly | 12/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |