Senate
|
08/11/2022
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2022
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 13. Noes 4. Page 1722.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1640.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1581.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2021
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|