|
09/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2727.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2223.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1691.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|