09/29/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 745, Statutes of 2022. | |||
09/29/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/30/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/23/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 4989.). | ||
Senate | 06/23/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 21). | ||
Senate | 06/13/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2022 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 3. Page 3344.) | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Read first time. To print. |