Senate
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4879.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Motion to reconsider made by Senator Umberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4878.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3441.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2022
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2022
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Luz Rivas.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Luz Rivas.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2021
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|