Assembly | 02/01/2022 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2022 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2021 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2021 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2021 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2021 | Read first time. To print. |