Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 1401.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|