Senate
|
09/10/2021
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2021
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2021
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to the Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 1739.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2021
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2021
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2021
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|