LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA14
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA14
Action History
Assembly
05/16/2022
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Assembly
05/12/2022
Read second time and amended.
Assembly
05/11/2022
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 11).
Assembly
04/07/2022
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Assembly
03/25/2022
From printer. May be heard in committee April 24.
Assembly
03/24/2022
Read first time. To print.