Senate
|
08/31/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2022
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4395.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2022
|
Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 21. Noes 6. Page 4395.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2022
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2022
|
Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 3915.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2021
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/19/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/18/2020
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|