LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA8
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA8
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA8
Action History
Assembly
05/02/2022
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Assembly
04/28/2022
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
04/07/2022
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Assembly
03/23/2021
From printer. May be heard in committee April 22.
Assembly
03/22/2021
Read first time. To print.