California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR100 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/14/2022

                    Enrolled  February 14, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  February 10, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 26, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 100Introduced by Assembly Member Carrillo(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021 Relative to Child Support Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 100, Carrillo. Child Support Awareness Month. This measure would recognize August 2021 as Child Support Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Children become healthy, productive, and well-adjusted adults through the support and nurturing of their families; andWHEREAS, Californias children have a right to receive emotional and financial support from both of their parents; andWHEREAS, California is strongly committed to promoting the health and well-being of all of Californias children by establishing paternity, ensuring parents pay child support on a regular and timely basis, and encouraging all parents to have a loving and supportive relationship with their children; andWHEREAS, Californias child support program provides an important opportunity for parents to be a positive force in the lives of their children. In 2020, California had a caseload of 1,100,000 child support cases and served over 2,000,000 children; andWHEREAS, California is a national leader in the amount of child support collected from parents, distributing more than $2,500,000,000 in child support payments in 2020; andWHEREAS, Child Support Awareness Month celebrates Californias nationally recognized record of providing services for parents and their children; andWHEREAS, Increasing public awareness of the importance of this issue through education and outreach will reinforce the need for all parents to take responsibility for the financial, emotional, and physical support of their children; andWHEREAS, Awareness of the needs of children and the responsibilities of parents to provide for the support of their children benefits all Californians; andWHEREAS, As Californians, we must rededicate ourselves to the task of putting our youngest and most vulnerable citizens first; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of August 2021 to be Child Support Awareness Month, and encourages all Californians to participate in the support and well-being of children; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  February 14, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  February 10, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 26, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 100Introduced by Assembly Member Carrillo(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021 Relative to Child Support Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 100, Carrillo. Child Support Awareness Month. This measure would recognize August 2021 as Child Support Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  February 14, 2022 Passed IN  Senate  February 10, 2022 Passed IN  Assembly  August 26, 2021

Enrolled  February 14, 2022
Passed IN  Senate  February 10, 2022
Passed IN  Assembly  August 26, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution 

No. 100

Introduced by Assembly Member Carrillo(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Member Carrillo(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)
August 16, 2021

 Relative to Child Support Awareness Month.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 100, Carrillo. Child Support Awareness Month. 

This measure would recognize August 2021 as Child Support Awareness Month.

This measure would recognize August 2021 as Child Support Awareness Month.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Children become healthy, productive, and well-adjusted adults through the support and nurturing of their families; and

WHEREAS, Californias children have a right to receive emotional and financial support from both of their parents; and

WHEREAS, California is strongly committed to promoting the health and well-being of all of Californias children by establishing paternity, ensuring parents pay child support on a regular and timely basis, and encouraging all parents to have a loving and supportive relationship with their children; and

WHEREAS, Californias child support program provides an important opportunity for parents to be a positive force in the lives of their children. In 2020, California had a caseload of 1,100,000 child support cases and served over 2,000,000 children; and

WHEREAS, California is a national leader in the amount of child support collected from parents, distributing more than $2,500,000,000 in child support payments in 2020; and

WHEREAS, Child Support Awareness Month celebrates Californias nationally recognized record of providing services for parents and their children; and

WHEREAS, Increasing public awareness of the importance of this issue through education and outreach will reinforce the need for all parents to take responsibility for the financial, emotional, and physical support of their children; and

WHEREAS, Awareness of the needs of children and the responsibilities of parents to provide for the support of their children benefits all Californians; and

WHEREAS, As Californians, we must rededicate ourselves to the task of putting our youngest and most vulnerable citizens first; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of August 2021 to be Child Support Awareness Month, and encourages all Californians to participate in the support and well-being of children; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.