1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 100 CHAPTER 6 Relative to Child Support Awareness Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 22, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 100, Carrillo. Child Support Awareness Month. This measure would recognize August 2021 as Child Support Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Children become healthy, productive, and well-adjusted adults through the support and nurturing of their families; andWHEREAS, Californias children have a right to receive emotional and financial support from both of their parents; andWHEREAS, California is strongly committed to promoting the health and well-being of all of Californias children by establishing paternity, ensuring parents pay child support on a regular and timely basis, and encouraging all parents to have a loving and supportive relationship with their children; andWHEREAS, Californias child support program provides an important opportunity for parents to be a positive force in the lives of their children. In 2020, California had a caseload of 1,100,000 child support cases and served over 2,000,000 children; andWHEREAS, California is a national leader in the amount of child support collected from parents, distributing more than $2,500,000,000 in child support payments in 2020; andWHEREAS, Child Support Awareness Month celebrates Californias nationally recognized record of providing services for parents and their children; andWHEREAS, Increasing public awareness of the importance of this issue through education and outreach will reinforce the need for all parents to take responsibility for the financial, emotional, and physical support of their children; andWHEREAS, Awareness of the needs of children and the responsibilities of parents to provide for the support of their children benefits all Californians; andWHEREAS, As Californians, we must rededicate ourselves to the task of putting our youngest and most vulnerable citizens first; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of August 2021 to be Child Support Awareness Month, and encourages all Californians to participate in the support and well-being of children; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 14, 2022 Passed IN Senate February 10, 2022 Passed IN Assembly August 26, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 100Introduced by Assembly Member Carrillo(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Davies, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Lorena Gonzalez, Gray, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Levine, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, and Wood)August 16, 2021 Relative to Child Support Awareness Month.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 100, Carrillo. Child Support Awareness Month. This measure would recognize August 2021 as Child Support Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Children become healthy, productive, and well-adjusted adults through the support and nurturing of their families; andWHEREAS, Californias children have a right to receive emotional and financial support from both of their parents; andWHEREAS, California is strongly committed to promoting the health and well-being of all of Californias children by establishing paternity, ensuring parents pay child support on a regular and timely basis, and encouraging all parents to have a loving and supportive relationship with their children; andWHEREAS, Californias child support program provides an important opportunity for parents to be a positive force in the lives of their children. In 2020, California had a caseload of 1,100,000 child support cases and served over 2,000,000 children; andWHEREAS, California is a national leader in the amount of child support collected from parents, distributing more than $2,500,000,000 in child support payments in 2020; andWHEREAS, Child Support Awareness Month celebrates Californias nationally recognized record of providing services for parents and their children; andWHEREAS, Increasing public awareness of the importance of this issue through education and outreach will reinforce the need for all parents to take responsibility for the financial, emotional, and physical support of their children; andWHEREAS, Awareness of the needs of children and the responsibilities of parents to provide for the support of their children benefits all Californians; andWHEREAS, As Californians, we must rededicate ourselves to the task of putting our youngest and most vulnerable citizens first; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of August 2021 to be Child Support Awareness Month, and encourages all Californians to participate in the support and well-being of children; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|