09/17/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/17/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2453.) | ||
Senate | 09/07/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2471.) | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | Introduced. To print. |