02/22/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2022. | |||
02/22/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 02/10/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2896.) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2519.) | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2021 | Introduced. To print. |