California 2021 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR104 Amended / Bill

Filed 09/01/2021

                    Amended IN  Assembly  September 01, 2021 Amended IN  Assembly  August 19, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 104Introduced by Assembly Member HoldenAugust 17, 2021Relative to a sister state relationship with Punjab, Pakistan. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 104, as amended, Holden. Punjab, Pakistan: sister state relationship.The measure would express the intent and commitment of the state to enter into a sister state relationship with the Province of Punjab, Pakistan, until December 31, 2026.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YESNO Bill TextWHEREAS, Punjab is Pakistans most populous province, with a population of about 110,000,000; andWHEREAS, Punjabs capital, Lahore, is a cultural, historical, economic, and cosmopolitan center of Pakistan where the countrys cinema industry and much of its fashion industry are based, similar to California; andWHEREAS, Agriculture continues to be the largest sector of Punjabs economy. The province is the breadbasket of the country, similar to California; andWHEREAS, There are over more than 250,000 Punjabi Americans in California, many of whom first settled in Californias central valley to do agricultural work; andWHEREAS, Punjab has the largest economy in Pakistan. In 2007, Punjab achieved a growth rate of 7.8 percent. During the period from 200203 to 200708, its economy grew at rates between 7 to 8 percent each year. During the 200809 fiscal year, Punjabs economy grew at a rate of 6 percent, substantially faster than the total gross domestic product growth of Pakistan; andWHEREAS, A sister-state relationship between the State of California and the Province of Punjab would promote mutual trade and commerce and increase the potential for educational, environmental, and cultural relations between the Province of Punjab and the State of California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California, on behalf of the people of California, extends to the people of the province of Punjab, Pakistan, an invitation to join with California in a sister state relationship until December 31, 2026, in order to encourage and facilitate mutually beneficial economic, educational, environmental, and cultural exchanges and to lead to a more indelible and lasting relationship between Californians and the people of the province of Punjab, Pakistan; and be it furtherResolved, That any sister state agreement developed will identify objectives, areas of mutual interest, a list of potential activities, and an initial list of public and private partners that will help to advance the purposes of the sister state agreement, including one or more entities that will serve as facilitators and general points of contact; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California, to the Governor of Punjab, to the Legislature of Punjab, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States. 

 Amended IN  Assembly  September 01, 2021 Amended IN  Assembly  August 19, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 104Introduced by Assembly Member HoldenAugust 17, 2021Relative to a sister state relationship with Punjab, Pakistan. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 104, as amended, Holden. Punjab, Pakistan: sister state relationship.The measure would express the intent and commitment of the state to enter into a sister state relationship with the Province of Punjab, Pakistan, until December 31, 2026.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YESNO 

 Amended IN  Assembly  September 01, 2021 Amended IN  Assembly  August 19, 2021

Amended IN  Assembly  September 01, 2021
Amended IN  Assembly  August 19, 2021

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution 

No. 104

Introduced by Assembly Member HoldenAugust 17, 2021

Introduced by Assembly Member Holden
August 17, 2021

Relative to a sister state relationship with Punjab, Pakistan. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 104, as amended, Holden. Punjab, Pakistan: sister state relationship.

The measure would express the intent and commitment of the state to enter into a sister state relationship with the Province of Punjab, Pakistan, until December 31, 2026.

The measure would express the intent and commitment of the state to enter into a sister state relationship with the Province of Punjab, Pakistan, until December 31, 2026.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Punjab is Pakistans most populous province, with a population of about 110,000,000; and

WHEREAS, Punjabs capital, Lahore, is a cultural, historical, economic, and cosmopolitan center of Pakistan where the countrys cinema industry and much of its fashion industry are based, similar to California; and

WHEREAS, Agriculture continues to be the largest sector of Punjabs economy. The province is the breadbasket of the country, similar to California; and

WHEREAS, There are over more than 250,000 Punjabi Americans in California, many of whom first settled in Californias central valley to do agricultural work; and

WHEREAS, Punjab has the largest economy in Pakistan. In 2007, Punjab achieved a growth rate of 7.8 percent. During the period from 200203 to 200708, its economy grew at rates between 7 to 8 percent each year. During the 200809 fiscal year, Punjabs economy grew at a rate of 6 percent, substantially faster than the total gross domestic product growth of Pakistan; and

WHEREAS, A sister-state relationship between the State of California and the Province of Punjab would promote mutual trade and commerce and increase the potential for educational, environmental, and cultural relations between the Province of Punjab and the State of California; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature of the State of California, on behalf of the people of California, extends to the people of the province of Punjab, Pakistan, an invitation to join with California in a sister state relationship until December 31, 2026, in order to encourage and facilitate mutually beneficial economic, educational, environmental, and cultural exchanges and to lead to a more indelible and lasting relationship between Californians and the people of the province of Punjab, Pakistan; and be it further

Resolved, That any sister state agreement developed will identify objectives, areas of mutual interest, a list of potential activities, and an initial list of public and private partners that will help to advance the purposes of the sister state agreement, including one or more entities that will serve as facilitators and general points of contact; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Governor of California, to the Governor of Punjab, to the Legislature of Punjab, and to each Senator and Representative from California in the Congress of the United States.