California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 15, 2022

Chaptered

Bill February 22, 2022

Amended

Bill September 1, 2021
Bill August 19, 2021