|
02/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2022
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2022
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2896.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
From committee: Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2021
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2770.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2770.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2021
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|