04/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2021. | |||
04/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 03/01/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 265.) | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 28). | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2021 | Introduced. To print. |