02/22/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2022. | |||
02/22/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 02/14/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2906.) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3324.) | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 6). | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. To print. |