05/10/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2022. | |||
05/10/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3584.) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 4215.) | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31). | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. To print. |