06/08/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 84, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/08/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/01/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4015.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4610.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2022 | Introduced. To print. |