08/19/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/19/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4716.) | ||
Senate | 08/08/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 23). | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2022 | Introduced. To print. |