08/19/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/19/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/11/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4717.) | ||
Senate | 08/08/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/03/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |