1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 123 CHAPTER 65Relative to Crime Victims Rights Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 01, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 123, Seyarto. Crime Victims Rights Week.This measure would recognize April 24, 2022, through April 30, 2022, as Crime Victims Rights Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Violent crime continues to exist in California, and crime in one part of the state, or crime against one person, affects our entire sense of well-being; andWHEREAS, All Californians are affected by crime, not just the victims of violent crime; andWHEREAS, The most effective aid that can be provided to victims of crime is to prevent crime from happening in the first place; andWHEREAS, Since 1981, National Crime Victims Rights Week has raised awareness of the special needs of crime victims; andWHEREAS, This year, the theme for this week is Rights, access, equity, for all victims.; andWHEREAS, The 2022 theme for National Crime Victims Rights Week underscores the importance of helping crime survivors find their justice by enforcing victims rights, expanding access to services, and ensuring equity and inclusion for all. We all have a part to play in reaching crime victims, especially those in marginalized communities, and supporting them on their healing journey; andWHEREAS, The year 2022 is a landmark year for crime victims and survivors, as well as those who serve them; andWHEREAS, The COVID-19 pandemic saw changes in the prevalence and types of crimes committed; andWHEREAS, The respect for and protection of victims rights within the legal process is one of the most critical components of an effective criminal justice system; andWHEREAS, Victims and witnesses of crime require special attention to ensure that they are thoroughly informed about, and effectively participate in, the criminal justice system; andWHEREAS, To the maximum extent allowed by law, victims of violent crime should receive compensation for their losses; andWHEREAS, Each day thousands of victims and witnesses receive assistance from victim support organizations, victim-witness assistance centers, private service providers, and state and local governments; andWHEREAS, The criminal justice system in this state must persist in its effort to better coordinate and improve the quality of services provided to victims and witnesses; andWHEREAS, California has been an innovator in the victims rights movement, establishing the first crime victim compensation program in the nation in 1965, Womens Advocates and Haven House in Pasadena established the first shelters for battered women in the nation in 1976, and Mothers Against Drunk Driving was founded in 1980 with the establishment of a chapter in Sacramento; andWHEREAS, California citizens enshrined victims rights in the California Constitution in 1982 through the passage of Proposition 8, the Victims Bill of Rights; andWHEREAS, California citizens reaffirmed and afforded additional rights to victims in the California Constitution and in California law in 2008 through the passage of Proposition 9, the Victims Bill of Rights Act of 2008: Marsys Law; andWHEREAS, Each year, the observance of National Crime Victims Rights Week focuses on the problems confronting victims of crime and the services available to support these victims; andWHEREAS, The remembrances observed during National Crime Victims Rights Week promote awareness of victims issues and acknowledge the combined efforts of citizens, the government, and the criminal justice system to improve victims services in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes April 24, 2022, through April 30, 2022, inclusive, as Crime Victims Rights Week in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 25, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 23, 2022 Passed IN Assembly April 21, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 123Introduced by Assembly Member Seyarto(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Choi, Flora, Lackey, Mathis, Nguyen, and Quirk-Silva)(Principal coauthors: Senators Caballero, Grove, Jones, Newman, Nielsen, Ochoa Bogh, and Wilk)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Cunningham, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mayes, Medina, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Waldron, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wilson, and Wood)January 19, 2022Seyarto, Relative to Crime Victims Rights Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 123, Seyarto. Crime Victims Rights Week.This measure would recognize April 24, 2022, through April 30, 2022, as Crime Victims Rights Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Violent crime continues to exist in California, and crime in one part of the state, or crime against one person, affects our entire sense of well-being; andWHEREAS, All Californians are affected by crime, not just the victims of violent crime; andWHEREAS, The most effective aid that can be provided to victims of crime is to prevent crime from happening in the first place; andWHEREAS, Since 1981, National Crime Victims Rights Week has raised awareness of the special needs of crime victims; andWHEREAS, This year, the theme for this week is Rights, access, equity, for all victims.; andWHEREAS, The 2022 theme for National Crime Victims Rights Week underscores the importance of helping crime survivors find their justice by enforcing victims rights, expanding access to services, and ensuring equity and inclusion for all. We all have a part to play in reaching crime victims, especially those in marginalized communities, and supporting them on their healing journey; andWHEREAS, The year 2022 is a landmark year for crime victims and survivors, as well as those who serve them; andWHEREAS, The COVID-19 pandemic saw changes in the prevalence and types of crimes committed; andWHEREAS, The respect for and protection of victims rights within the legal process is one of the most critical components of an effective criminal justice system; andWHEREAS, Victims and witnesses of crime require special attention to ensure that they are thoroughly informed about, and effectively participate in, the criminal justice system; andWHEREAS, To the maximum extent allowed by law, victims of violent crime should receive compensation for their losses; andWHEREAS, Each day thousands of victims and witnesses receive assistance from victim support organizations, victim-witness assistance centers, private service providers, and state and local governments; andWHEREAS, The criminal justice system in this state must persist in its effort to better coordinate and improve the quality of services provided to victims and witnesses; andWHEREAS, California has been an innovator in the victims rights movement, establishing the first crime victim compensation program in the nation in 1965, Womens Advocates and Haven House in Pasadena established the first shelters for battered women in the nation in 1976, and Mothers Against Drunk Driving was founded in 1980 with the establishment of a chapter in Sacramento; andWHEREAS, California citizens enshrined victims rights in the California Constitution in 1982 through the passage of Proposition 8, the Victims Bill of Rights; andWHEREAS, California citizens reaffirmed and afforded additional rights to victims in the California Constitution and in California law in 2008 through the passage of Proposition 9, the Victims Bill of Rights Act of 2008: Marsys Law; andWHEREAS, Each year, the observance of National Crime Victims Rights Week focuses on the problems confronting victims of crime and the services available to support these victims; andWHEREAS, The remembrances observed during National Crime Victims Rights Week promote awareness of victims issues and acknowledge the combined efforts of citizens, the government, and the criminal justice system to improve victims services in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes April 24, 2022, through April 30, 2022, inclusive, as Crime Victims Rights Week in California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|