07/12/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2022. | |||
07/12/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4576.) | ||
Senate | 06/28/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2022 | Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2022 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2022 | Introduced. To print. |