Senate | 08/08/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2022 | Introduced. To print. |