03/28/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2022. | |||
03/28/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3162.) | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3749.) | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. To print. |