04/18/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2022. | |||
04/15/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3359.) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3912.) | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2022 | Introduced. To print. |