08/30/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2022. | |||
08/30/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/23/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4973.) | ||
Senate | 08/18/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/17/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/10/2022 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/30/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2022 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2022 | Introduced. To print. |