06/08/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/08/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4058.) | ||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2022 | Introduced. To print. |