1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 179 CHAPTER 137 Relative to Student Mental Health Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 19, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 179, ODonnell. Student Mental Health Week.This measure would declare the week of May 9, 2022, to May 13, 2022, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Student mental health needs too often go unnoticed or unaddressed at school; andWHEREAS, Reducing the stigma surrounding mental health will empower students to speak up when they need help; andWHEREAS, Research has shown that adverse childhood experiences have lasting harmful impacts and can leave students feeling disenfranchised if not addressed; andWHEREAS, Students in California are subjected to community- and school-based acts of violence or threats; andWHEREAS, Many students in California have experienced traumatic natural disaster events, including wildfires, mudslides, evacuations, and earthquakes; andWHEREAS, The overuse of social media can result in students feeling disconnected from their peers; andWHEREAS, The early identification of, intervention in, and treatment of mental health and behavioral issues is paramount for a healthy student body and school community; andWHEREAS, Prekindergarten, kindergarten, and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, through their unique role in serving children and youth, have an opportunity to address student health early and effectively; andWHEREAS, The need for comprehensive, coordinated mental health services for students in school is a critical responsibility as part of an overall education plan; andWHEREAS, Addressing the complex mental health needs of California students today is fundamental to the future of California; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate that a week should be set aside each year for the direction of our thoughts towards our students mental health and well-being; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares the week of May 9, 2022, to May 13, 2022, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 17, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 16, 2022 Passed IN Assembly May 05, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 179Introduced by Assembly Member ODonnell(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Mia Bonta, Calderon, Carrillo, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Megan Dahle, Daly, Davies, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Eduardo Garcia, Gray, Grayson, Haney, Holden, Irwin, Lackey, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Ting, Valladares, Voepel, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wilson, and Wood)April 20, 2022 Relative to Student Mental Health Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 179, ODonnell. Student Mental Health Week.This measure would declare the week of May 9, 2022, to May 13, 2022, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Student mental health needs too often go unnoticed or unaddressed at school; andWHEREAS, Reducing the stigma surrounding mental health will empower students to speak up when they need help; andWHEREAS, Research has shown that adverse childhood experiences have lasting harmful impacts and can leave students feeling disenfranchised if not addressed; andWHEREAS, Students in California are subjected to community- and school-based acts of violence or threats; andWHEREAS, Many students in California have experienced traumatic natural disaster events, including wildfires, mudslides, evacuations, and earthquakes; andWHEREAS, The overuse of social media can result in students feeling disconnected from their peers; andWHEREAS, The early identification of, intervention in, and treatment of mental health and behavioral issues is paramount for a healthy student body and school community; andWHEREAS, Prekindergarten, kindergarten, and grades 1 to 12, inclusive, through their unique role in serving children and youth, have an opportunity to address student health early and effectively; andWHEREAS, The need for comprehensive, coordinated mental health services for students in school is a critical responsibility as part of an overall education plan; andWHEREAS, Addressing the complex mental health needs of California students today is fundamental to the future of California; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate that a week should be set aside each year for the direction of our thoughts towards our students mental health and well-being; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares the week of May 9, 2022, to May 13, 2022, inclusive, as Student Mental Health Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|