Senate | 08/25/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2022 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | Introduced. To print. |