1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 185 CHAPTER 72 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 01, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 185, Quirk-Silva. Arab American Heritage Month.This measure would proclaim April 2022 to be Arab American Heritage Month and would encourage every citizen to join in its special observance.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For over a century, Arab Americans have been making valuable contributions to every aspect of American society, including in medicine, law, business, education, technology, government, military service, and culture; andWHEREAS, Since immigrating to America, men and women of Arab descent have shared their rich cultures and traditions with neighbors and friends, while also setting fine examples as model citizens and public servants; and WHEREAS, Arab Americans brought with them to America their resilient family values, strong work ethic, dedication to education, and diversity in faith and creed, all of which have added strength to our great democracy; and WHEREAS, Arab Americans have also enriched our society by sharing in the entrepreneurial American spirit that makes our nation free and prosperous; and WHEREAS, The history of Arab Americans in the United States remains neglected and tarnished by misconceptions, bigotry, and anti-Arab behavior in the forms of hate crimes and hate speech; and WHEREAS, Arab American issues, such as civil rights abuses, harmful stereotyping, and bullying must be combated through education and awareness; and WHEREAS, Arab Americans join all Americans in the desire to see a peaceful and diverse society, where every individual is treated equally and feels safe; and WHEREAS, California is home to a unique area known as Little Arabia in the City of Anaheim, which is a cultural and business destination for Arab Americans and Americans of diverse backgrounds who enjoy Arab food and culture; andWHEREAS, The profound and significant contributions and heritage of Arab Americans have helped to build a better nation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of April 2022 to be Arab American Heritage Month and encourages every citizen to join in its special observance; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 25, 2022 Passed IN Senate May 23, 2022 Passed IN Assembly May 02, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 185Introduced by Assembly Member Quirk-Silva(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bryan, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Choi, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Daly, Davies, Flora, Fong, Mike Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Lee, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Nguyen, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Seyarto, Smith, Stone, Ting, Valladares, Villapudua, Voepel, Ward, Akilah Weber, Wicks, Wilson, and Wood)April 26, 2022 Relative to Arab American Heritage Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 185, Quirk-Silva. Arab American Heritage Month.This measure would proclaim April 2022 to be Arab American Heritage Month and would encourage every citizen to join in its special observance.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For over a century, Arab Americans have been making valuable contributions to every aspect of American society, including in medicine, law, business, education, technology, government, military service, and culture; andWHEREAS, Since immigrating to America, men and women of Arab descent have shared their rich cultures and traditions with neighbors and friends, while also setting fine examples as model citizens and public servants; and WHEREAS, Arab Americans brought with them to America their resilient family values, strong work ethic, dedication to education, and diversity in faith and creed, all of which have added strength to our great democracy; and WHEREAS, Arab Americans have also enriched our society by sharing in the entrepreneurial American spirit that makes our nation free and prosperous; and WHEREAS, The history of Arab Americans in the United States remains neglected and tarnished by misconceptions, bigotry, and anti-Arab behavior in the forms of hate crimes and hate speech; and WHEREAS, Arab American issues, such as civil rights abuses, harmful stereotyping, and bullying must be combated through education and awareness; and WHEREAS, Arab Americans join all Americans in the desire to see a peaceful and diverse society, where every individual is treated equally and feels safe; and WHEREAS, California is home to a unique area known as Little Arabia in the City of Anaheim, which is a cultural and business destination for Arab Americans and Americans of diverse backgrounds who enjoy Arab food and culture; andWHEREAS, The profound and significant contributions and heritage of Arab Americans have helped to build a better nation; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the month of April 2022 to be Arab American Heritage Month and encourages every citizen to join in its special observance; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|