09/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/31/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2239.) | ||
Senate | 08/16/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2021 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 1723.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1156.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2021 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2021 | Introduced. To print. |