06/28/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/28/2022 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/16/2022 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2022 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4266.) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2022 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2022 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 19). | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2022 | Introduced. To print. |