1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 204 CHAPTER 167 Relative to the Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 30, 2022. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 204, Stone. Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 1 in the County of Monterey as the Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell died July 7, 2007, from an injury sustained during a sandstorm while supporting operations for the Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership in Kidal, Mali; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell was the team leader for Special Operations Team Alpha 013, Military Intelligence Detachment, Headquarters Support Company, 1st Battalion, 10th Special Forces Group (Airborne), Stuttgart, Germany; andWHEREAS, Born on April 25, 1972, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell was raised in the City of Monterey, where he received an Associates of Arts in 2002 in both Russian and Serbo-Croatian from the Defense Language Institute (DLI), Foreign Language Center, Monterey; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell entered the service in 1997 and received his basic training at Fort Leonard Wood, Missouri; he then attended the DLI Basic Russian Course at the Presidio of the City of Monterey, and completed his Advanced Individual Training at Goodfellow Air Force Base in San Angelo, Texas, in 1999 and was assigned Bravo Company, 1st Military Intelligence Battalion, Wiesbaden, Germany; andWHEREAS, After returning to DLI and completing the Basic Serbo-Croatian Course, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell volunteered for airborne duty in 2002 and followon assignment to the 1st Battalion, 10th Special Forces Group (Airborne), where he deployed to various locations in Africa and the Balkans, and served multiple combat tours in Afghanistan; and WHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchells military education also includes the Warrior Leader Course, Basic Noncommissioned Officer (NCO) Course, Basic Airborne Course, and the Patrol Medic and Vehicle Reconnaissance Courses; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchells awards and decorations include the Meritorious Service Medal, Joint Service Commendation Medal with bronze oak leaf cluster, Army Commendation Medal, Joint Service Achievement Medal, Army Achievement Medal, Army Good Conduct Medal with 3 knots, National Defense Service Medal, Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal, Kosovo Campaign Medal, Global War on Terrorism Service Medal, Armed Forces Service Medal, NCO Professional Development Ribbon with numeral 2, Army Service Ribbon, Overseas Service Ribbon, NATO Medal with bronze star device, and the Malian Cross of Valor; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell is survived by his wife, Sonja, and their son, Cameron, both of Stuttgart, Germany, his mother, Joan Mitchell of the City of Monterey, and his father, Steven Mitchell; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 1 in the County of Monterey, from postmarker R75.5 to postmarker R76.5, as the Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 25, 2022 Passed IN Senate August 23, 2022 Passed IN Assembly June 16, 2022 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 204Introduced by Assembly Member StoneJune 08, 2022 Relative to the Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 204, Stone. Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 1 in the County of Monterey as the Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway. The measure would request that the Department of Transportation determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell died July 7, 2007, from an injury sustained during a sandstorm while supporting operations for the Trans-Sahara Counterterrorism Partnership in Kidal, Mali; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell was the team leader for Special Operations Team Alpha 013, Military Intelligence Detachment, Headquarters Support Company, 1st Battalion, 10th Special Forces Group (Airborne), Stuttgart, Germany; andWHEREAS, Born on April 25, 1972, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell was raised in the City of Monterey, where he received an Associates of Arts in 2002 in both Russian and Serbo-Croatian from the Defense Language Institute (DLI), Foreign Language Center, Monterey; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell entered the service in 1997 and received his basic training at Fort Leonard Wood, Missouri; he then attended the DLI Basic Russian Course at the Presidio of the City of Monterey, and completed his Advanced Individual Training at Goodfellow Air Force Base in San Angelo, Texas, in 1999 and was assigned Bravo Company, 1st Military Intelligence Battalion, Wiesbaden, Germany; andWHEREAS, After returning to DLI and completing the Basic Serbo-Croation Course, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell volunteered for airborne duty in 2002 and followon assignment to the 1st Battalion, 10th Special Forces Group (Airborne), where he deployed to various locations in Africa and the Balkans, and served multiple combat tours in Afghanistan; and WHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchells military education also includes the Warrior Leader Course, Basic Noncommissioned Officer (NCO) Course, Basic Airborne Course, and the Patrol Medic and Vehicle Reconnaissance Courses; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchells awards and decorations include the Meritorious Service Medal, Joint Service Commendation Medal with bronze oak leaf cluster, Army Commendation Medal, Joint Service Achievement Medal, Army Achievement Medal, Army Good Conduct Medal with 3 knots, National Defense Service Medal, Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal, Kosovo Campaign Medal, Global War on Terrorism Service Medal, Armed Forces Service Medal, NCO Professional Development Ribbon with numeral 2, Army Service Ribbon, Overseas Service Ribbon, NATO Medal with bronze star device, and the Malian Cross of Valor; andWHEREAS, Sgt. 1st Class Mitchell is survived by his wife, Sonja, and their son, Cameron, both of Stuttgart, Germany, his mother, Joan Mitchell of the City of Monterey, and his father, Steven Mitchell; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 1 in the County of Monterey, from postmarker R75.5 to postmarker R76.5, as the Sergeant 1st Class Sean K. Mitchell Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|