09/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/31/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2239.) | ||
Senate | 08/16/2021 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/15/2021 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2021 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 1723.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 932.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2021 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2021 | Introduced. To print. |