Senate | 08/08/2022 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2022 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2022 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2022 | Introduced. To print. |