06/11/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 45, Statutes of 2021. | |||
06/11/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/02/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1352.) | ||
Senate | 05/28/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1410.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2021 | Introduced. To print. |