California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR27 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 27 CHAPTER 109Relative to the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 07, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 27, Gallagher. Farm-to-Fork Corridor.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 99 in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Farmers in the Counties of Butte, Sutter, Tehama, and Yuba have provided fresh agricultural commodities and produce to Californians for generations; andWHEREAS, Farmers in these counties continue to provide quality agricultural commodities and produce to the City of Sacramento and the greater United States; andWHEREAS, The City of Sacramento is known as Americas Farm-to-Fork Capital; andWHEREAS, High-quality agricultural commodities and produce are frequently transported to the City of Sacramento and the greater United States via State Route 99; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the portion of State Route 99 from post mile 20.400 at Eldrid Avenue near the community of Dairyville to post mile 24.529 near Arch Street in the City of Red Bluff in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signage requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled September 01, 2021 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2021 Passed IN Assembly April 22, 2021 Amended IN Assembly April 06, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Assembly Member GallagherFebruary 09, 2021Relative to the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 27, Gallagher. Farm-to-Fork Corridor.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 99 in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Farmers in the Counties of Butte, Sutter, Tehama, and Yuba have provided fresh agricultural commodities and produce to Californians for generations; andWHEREAS, Farmers in these counties continue to provide quality agricultural commodities and produce to the City of Sacramento and the greater United States; andWHEREAS, The City of Sacramento is known as Americas Farm-to-Fork Capital; andWHEREAS, High-quality agricultural commodities and produce are frequently transported to the City of Sacramento and the greater United States via State Route 99; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the portion of State Route 99 from post mile 20.400 at Eldrid Avenue near the community of Dairyville to post mile 24.529 near Arch Street in the City of Red Bluff in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signage requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 27 CHAPTER 109Relative to the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 07, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 27, Gallagher. Farm-to-Fork Corridor.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 99 in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES
3+ Enrolled September 01, 2021 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2021 Passed IN Assembly April 22, 2021 Amended IN Assembly April 06, 2021 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 27Introduced by Assembly Member GallagherFebruary 09, 2021Relative to the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 27, Gallagher. Farm-to-Fork Corridor.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 99 in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES
44
5- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 27 CHAPTER 109
5+ Enrolled September 01, 2021 Passed IN Senate August 30, 2021 Passed IN Assembly April 22, 2021 Amended IN Assembly April 06, 2021
66
7- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 27
7+Enrolled September 01, 2021
8+Passed IN Senate August 30, 2021
9+Passed IN Assembly April 22, 2021
10+Amended IN Assembly April 06, 2021
811
9- CHAPTER 109
12+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20212022 REGULAR SESSION
13+
14+ Assembly Concurrent Resolution
15+
16+No. 27
17+
18+Introduced by Assembly Member GallagherFebruary 09, 2021
19+
20+Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher
21+February 09, 2021
1022
1123 Relative to the Farm-to-Fork Corridor.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State September 07, 2021. ]
1424
1525 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1626
1727 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1828
1929 ACR 27, Gallagher. Farm-to-Fork Corridor.
2030
2131 This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 99 in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs.
2232
2333 This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 99 in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs.
2434
2535 ## Digest Key
2636
2737 ## Bill Text
2838
2939 WHEREAS, Farmers in the Counties of Butte, Sutter, Tehama, and Yuba have provided fresh agricultural commodities and produce to Californians for generations; and
3040
3141 WHEREAS, Farmers in these counties continue to provide quality agricultural commodities and produce to the City of Sacramento and the greater United States; and
3242
3343 WHEREAS, The City of Sacramento is known as Americas Farm-to-Fork Capital; and
3444
3545 WHEREAS, High-quality agricultural commodities and produce are frequently transported to the City of Sacramento and the greater United States via State Route 99; now, therefore, be it
3646
3747 Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature designates the portion of State Route 99 from post mile 20.400 at Eldrid Avenue near the community of Dairyville to post mile 24.529 near Arch Street in the City of Red Bluff in the County of Tehama as the Farm-to-Fork Corridor; and be it further
3848
3949 Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signage requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further
4050
4151 Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.