09/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/31/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.) | ||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/18/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/12/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2315.) | ||
Assembly | 07/07/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2021 | Introduced. To print. |