07/01/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2021. | |||
07/01/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/24/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1636.) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1859.) | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 28). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2021 | Introduced. To print. |