09/17/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2021. | |||
09/17/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2453.) | ||
Senate | 09/07/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2437.) | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/15/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2021 | Introduced. To print. |