04/16/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2021. | |||
04/16/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/12/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 691.) | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 11). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2021 | Introduced. To print. |