|
09/17/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2657.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2243.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2021
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2021
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2021
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1033.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2021
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2021
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2021
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|