05/07/2021 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2021. | |||
05/07/2021 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/03/2021 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1009.) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2021 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1070.) | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2021 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2021 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2021 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2021 | Introduced. To print. |