California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR63 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/03/2021

                            Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 63 CHAPTER 29 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 03, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 63, Salas. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.This measure would designate the week of April 11, 2021, to April 17, 2021, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, When an emergency occurs, the prompt response of public safety personnel is critical to the protection of life and preservation of property; and WHEREAS, Thousands of dedicated public safety dispatchers serve the citizens of the State of California on a daily basis by answering emergency and nonemergency calls for assistance and coordinating public safety field units; and WHEREAS, These career professionals answer over 27,000,000 911 calls annually; and WHEREAS, These professionals measure their success in the lives that are saved by the 911 system each and every day; and WHEREAS, Public safety dispatchers have contributed substantially to the apprehension of criminals, suppression of fires, and helping others during a critical time of need; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals work under challenging and stressful circumstances; and WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals dedicate their lives and careers to helping others; and WHEREAS, Effective January 1, 2021, Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 2020 recognized public safety dispatchers as first responders in the State of California; and WHEREAS, In 1991, the United States Congress designated the second week in April as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; and WHEREAS, California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week will recognize all public safety dispatchers who are an integral part of Californias first responder team, who work 24 hours per day, seven days per week, and serve as the first critical contact our citizens have with emergency services; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Assembly advocates for an improved emergency telephone number network through research, planning, training, and education, and strives to allow citizens to have immediate access to emergency public safety services in order to protect human life and property and support civic welfare; and be it furtherResolved, That the Assembly declares the week of April 11, 2021, to April 17, 2021, inclusive, to be California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and honors and recognizes the importance and contributions of Californias public safety communications professionals and commends them for their continued commitment and service to the residents of California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 63 CHAPTER 29 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 03, 2021. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 63, Salas. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.This measure would designate the week of April 11, 2021, to April 17, 2021, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 63 CHAPTER 29

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 63

 CHAPTER 29

 Relative to California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week. 

 [ Filed with  Secretary of State  May 03, 2021. ] 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 63, Salas. California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

This measure would designate the week of April 11, 2021, to April 17, 2021, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

This measure would designate the week of April 11, 2021, to April 17, 2021, inclusive, as California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, When an emergency occurs, the prompt response of public safety personnel is critical to the protection of life and preservation of property; and 

WHEREAS, Thousands of dedicated public safety dispatchers serve the citizens of the State of California on a daily basis by answering emergency and nonemergency calls for assistance and coordinating public safety field units; and 

WHEREAS, These career professionals answer over 27,000,000 911 calls annually; and 

WHEREAS, These professionals measure their success in the lives that are saved by the 911 system each and every day; and 

WHEREAS, Public safety dispatchers have contributed substantially to the apprehension of criminals, suppression of fires, and helping others during a critical time of need; and 

WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals work under challenging and stressful circumstances; and 

WHEREAS, Public safety communications professionals dedicate their lives and careers to helping others; and 

WHEREAS, Effective January 1, 2021, Chapter 68 of the Statutes of 2020 recognized public safety dispatchers as first responders in the State of California; and 

WHEREAS, In 1991, the United States Congress designated the second week in April as National Public Safety Telecommunicators Week; and 

WHEREAS, California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week will recognize all public safety dispatchers who are an integral part of Californias first responder team, who work 24 hours per day, seven days per week, and serve as the first critical contact our citizens have with emergency services; now, therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Assembly advocates for an improved emergency telephone number network through research, planning, training, and education, and strives to allow citizens to have immediate access to emergency public safety services in order to protect human life and property and support civic welfare; and be it further

Resolved, That the Assembly declares the week of April 11, 2021, to April 17, 2021, inclusive, to be California Public Safety Telecommunicators Week, and honors and recognizes the importance and contributions of Californias public safety communications professionals and commends them for their continued commitment and service to the residents of California; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.